IA HF2236 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning fees charged for examining and copying public records relating to claims for veterans benefits. (Formerly HF 2022.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act concerning fees charged for examining and copying public records relating to claims for veterans benefits. (Formerly HF 2022.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 789. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 788. |
2020-06-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 648. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 699. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 698. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 538. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2020 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Costello, and Dotzler. S.J. 451. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 408. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 408. |
2020-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 348. |
2020-03-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 443. |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 344. |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 185. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 348.