IA HF2231 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2447.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2447.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an assault of a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(See HF 2447.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to an assault of a pregnant person, and providing penalties.(See HF 2447.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2447. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 286. |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2022 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor added, Latham. H.J. 197. |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Westrich, Fry and Kressig. H.J. 199. |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 170. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2447 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Amendment H-8125 filed. H.J. 490.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2231 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2231.html |