IA HF2216 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds for certain general county purposes. (See HF 2433.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of general obligation bonds for certain general county purposes. (See HF 2433.)
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Nielsen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Nielsen. H.J. 217. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 199. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2433 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2216 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2216.html |