IA HF2209 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 198.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 198.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the standard of judicial review and providing a claim or defense when a state action burdens a person’s exercise of religion, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the standard of judicial review and providing a claim or defense when a state action burdens a person’s exercise of religion, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] | Rep. Larry Sheets [R] | Rep. Andy Mckean [R] | Rep. John Landon [R] |
Rep. Terry Baxter [R] | Rep. Dean Fisher [R] | Rep. Skyler Wheeler [R] | Rep. Ralph Watts [R] |
Rep. Kristi Hager [R] | Rep. Greg Heartsill [R] | Rep. Steven Holt [R] | Rep. Stan Gustafson [R] |
Rep. Tom Moore [R] | Rep. Tedd Gassman [R] | Rep. John Wills [R] | Rep. Walt Rogers [R] |
Rep. Kevin Koester [R] | Rep. Shannon Lundgren [R] | Rep. Cecil Dolecheck [R] | Rep. Ken Rizer [R] |
Rep. David Kerr [R] | Rep. Robert Bacon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 198. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Carlin. S.J. 276.
SSB3171 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2338 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. S.J. 693.
SSB3171 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2338 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. S.J. 693.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2209 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2209.html |