IA SF2338 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Local Government. S.J. 693.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the standard of judicial review and providing a claim or defense when a state action burdens a person’s exercise of religion, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3171.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the standard of judicial review and providing a claim or defense when a state action burdens a person’s exercise of religion, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3171.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government. S.J. 693. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 357. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 346. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2154 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Carlin. S.J. 276.
HF2209 (Similar To) 2018-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 198.
SSB3171 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2209 (Similar To) 2018-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 198.
SSB3171 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2338 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2338.html |