IA HF2198 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the indemnification of claims from the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, by persons selling grain by credit-sale contract, and providing for fees. (See HF 2566.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the indemnification of claims from the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, by persons selling grain by credit-sale contract, and providing for fees. (See HF 2566.)
Sponsors
Rep. John Landon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 484. |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 308. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2020 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Sieck, Gerhold and Wolfe. H.J. 220. |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 176. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3151 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2367.
SF2367 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Attached to companion HF 2566. S.J. 536.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2367. S.J. 536.
SF2367 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Attached to companion HF 2566. S.J. 536.
HF2566 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Read first time, attached to companion SF 2367. S.J. 536.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2198 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2198.html |