IA HF2107 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2287.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the disabled veteran homestead tax credit and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2287.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the disabled veteran homestead tax credit and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 2287.)
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2287. |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 186. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 5:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Stone, Wilburn and Wills. H.J. 159. |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 124. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2287 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2107.html |