IA HF2088 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2606.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to additional penalties for violations for failing to reduce speed when required or otherwise control a motor vehicle that result in serious injury or death.(See HF 2606.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to additional penalties for violations for failing to reduce speed when required or otherwise control a motor vehicle that result in serious injury or death.(See HF 2606.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2606. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 284. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 8:00AM RM 19. |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Meggers, Henderson and Meyer, B. H.J. 232. |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 114. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2606 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2088 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2088.html |