IA HF2042 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of senior crossbow deer hunting licenses. (See HF 2174.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the issuance of senior crossbow deer hunting licenses. (See HF 2174.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Fisher and H. Miller. H.J. 130. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 114. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2174 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 593.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2042 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2042.html |