IA HF2019 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of an advanced opportunities program for certain students enrolled in public schools to take overload and dual credit courses, postsecondary credit-bearing and career and technical education certificate examinations, and career and technical education workforce training courses, and the award of a scholarship for early graduation.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of an advanced opportunities program for certain students enrolled in public schools to take overload and dual credit courses, postsecondary credit-bearing and career and technical education certificate examinations, and career and technical education workforce training courses, and the award of a scholarship for early graduation.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, Smith and Stone. H.J. 68. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 32. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2019 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2019.html |