IA HF170 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an appropriation to support the national junior angus show and including effective date provisions. (See HF 596.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to an appropriation to support the national junior angus show and including effective date provisions. (See HF 596.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1074. |
2017-03-15 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 668. |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Bearinger and Fisher. H.J. 416. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 169. |
Same As/Similar To
HF596 (Similar To) 2017-04-19 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF170 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF170.html |