IA HF596 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an appropriation to support the national junior angus show and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 170.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to an appropriation to support the national junior angus show and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 170.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1064. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1064. |
2017-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2017-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1074. |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 1064. |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818. |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 674. |
Same As/Similar To
HF170 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.