IA HF13 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rural emergency hospitals, including licensing requirements and fees, making penalties applicable, providing emergency rulemaking authority, and including applicability and effective date provisions.(See HF 144.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rural emergency hospitals, including licensing requirements and fees, making penalties applicable, providing emergency rulemaking authority, and including applicability and effective date provisions.(See HF 144.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 144. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 179. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:00PM RM 304. |
2023-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Matson and Wood. H.J. 72. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
SF75 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
HF144 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442.
HF144 (Similar To) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF13 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF13.html |