IA HF144 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rural emergency hospitals, including licensing requirements and fees, making penalties applicable, providing emergency rulemaking authority, and including applicability and effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 13.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to rural emergency hospitals, including licensing requirements and fees, making penalties applicable, providing emergency rulemaking authority, and including applicability and effective date provisions.(Formerly HF 13.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 442. |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment H-1021 filed. H.J. 310. |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment H-1010 filed. H.J. 263. |
2023-02-01 | House | Amendment H-1006 filed. H.J. 232. |
2023-01-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 196. |
Same As/Similar To
HF13 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 144.
SF75 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
SF75 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF144 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF144.html |