IA HF100 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adoption tax credit available against the individual income tax.(See HF 369.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adoption tax credit available against the individual income tax.(See HF 369.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 369. |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 287. |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Brown-Powers and Jones. H.J. 125. |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 112. |
Same As/Similar To
HF369 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 896.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF100 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF100.html |