HI SR96 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR96
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Propose And Pass A Proposed Amendment To The United States Constitution Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution To Clarify The Constitutional Right To Bear Arms.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Propose And Pass A Proposed Amendment To The United States Constitution Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution To Clarify The Constitutional Right To Bear Arms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR96 (Carry Over) 2017-05-04 - Adopted.
HR167 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39
HR167 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 39
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=96&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SR96_.HTM |