HI SR96 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating The Month Of October Of Each Year As "farm To School Month" In Hawaii To Strengthen And Support Farm To School Initiatives In Hawaii's Schools.
Title
Farm to School Month; October
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-16. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Reported from EDU/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3252) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, K.Kahele. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-16 12:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WLA. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |