HI SR86 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And United States Military To Coordinate And Address The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within Waipahu And The Surrounding Communities Of Ewa, Pearl City, And Aiea On Oahu.
Title
Urging The State, City And County Of Honolulu, And United States Military To Coordinate And Address The Issue Of Illegal Dumping Within Waipahu And The Surrounding Communities Of Ewa, Pearl City, And Aiea On Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3529) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR104 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 682).