HI SR82 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR82

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Install A Raised Crosswalk At The Intersection Of Keoneula Boulevard And Kamakana Street.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Install A Raised Crosswalk At The Intersection Of Keoneula Boulevard And Kamakana Street.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-06SenateReferred to TRS.
2020-03-06SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR82 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback