HI SR79 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Wellness And Resilience Establish The Malama Ohana Working Group To Identify, Design, And Recommend Transformative Changes To The State's Child Welfare System.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Wellness And Resilience Establish The Malama Ohana Working Group To Identify, Design, And Recommend Transformative Changes To The State's Child Welfare System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-23. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1473) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to HHS. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR131 (Same As) 2023-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lamosao, Pierick, Saiki excused (3).
SCR88 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).
SCR88 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Nakashima excused (2).