HI SR76 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Rules To Allow Cottage Food Operators To Legally Operate In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Department Of Health To Adopt Rules To Allow Cottage Food Operators To Legally Operate In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to ETT, CPH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR76 (Carry Over) 2017-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=76&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SR76_.HTM |