HI SR72 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SR72

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to LBR/CPH.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review Regarding The Performance Of "incidental And Supplemental" Contracting Work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review Regarding The Performance Of "incidental And Supplemental" Contracting Work.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateReferred to LBR/CPH.
2018-03-09SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SR72 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HR67 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback