HI SR68 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/EDU.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/EDU.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curricula Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Their Programs.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii System And Department Of Education To Include Training, Courses, And Curricula Related To The Mechanics, Repair, And Maintenance Of Electric Vehicles, Hydrogen Vehicles, And Other Alternative Fuel Vehicles In Their Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE/EDU. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR68 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Referred to HRE/EDU.
HR21 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR89 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31
HR21 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 15
SCR89 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to EDN/HET, FIN, referral sheet 31
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=68&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SR68_.HTM |