HI SR60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Review Of The Professional And Vocational Licensing Division's Forty-eight Licensing Areas And Recommend Whether Any Of The Licensing Boards, Commissions, Or Programs Or Their Administrative Functions Could Be Streamlined Or Consolidated.
Title
Auditor; Professional and Vocational Licensing Division; Boards, Commissions, and Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=60&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR60_.HTM |