HI SR58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Install A New Emergency Siren Near The Intersection Of Aumakua Street And Auhuhu Street In Upper Pacific Palisades.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Emergency Management Agency To Install A New Emergency Siren Near The Intersection Of Aumakua Street And Auhuhu Street In Upper Pacific Palisades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3531) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR73 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR70 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).
SCR70 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Garcia, Hashem, Holt, Poepoe, Yamashita excused (7).