HI SR56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR56
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Protect Pedestrians On Sidewalks By Creating Separate Facilities For Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes.
Title
Requesting That The City And County Of Honolulu Protect Pedestrians On Sidewalks By Creating Separate Facilities For Electric Scooters, Electric Bicycles, And Electric Trikes.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1404) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:15PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR56 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR76 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32
SCR76 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 32