HI SR53 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Of Hawaii, City And County Of Honolulu, Federal Entities, And Private Land Owners To Work Together To Immediately Open The Section Of The Waianae Coast Emergency Access Road Extending Paakea Road Out To Lualualei Naval Road For Public Use On A Permanent Basis.
Title
Urging The State Of Hawaii, City And County Of Honolulu, Federal Entities, And Private Land Owners To Work Together To Immediately Open The Section Of The Waianae Coast Emergency Access Road Extending Paakea Road Out To Lualualei Naval Road For Public Use On A Permanent Basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-23. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1465) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR179 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.