HI SR51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - (S) The committee(s) on EDH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - (S) The committee(s) on EDH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That Funds Be Made Available And Released To Enable The Hawaii Public Housing Authority To Implement A Tenant Monitor Program.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Tenant Monitor Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH will hold a public decision making on 04-07-10 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Referred to EDH, WAM. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR120 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - (H) Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 67
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=51&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SR51_.HTM |