HI SR40 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The University Of Hawaii At Manoa To Extend Its Rainbow Shuttle Service Into The Kapahulu And Waikiki Communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The University Of Hawaii At Manoa To Extend Its Rainbow Shuttle Service Into The Kapahulu And Waikiki Communities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-04-04SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1885), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-11SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback