HI SR40 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging Reform In The Military Investigatory And Prosecutorial Systems Governing Child Sexual Abuse And Increased Transparency In The Military Justice System And Military Reporting Of Criminal Sex Offenses Involving Children.
Title
Military; Child Sexual Abuse; Investigation and Prosecution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3395) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 8:35AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3173), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=40&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SR40_.HTM |