HI SR4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR4
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Study The Feasibility Of Increasing The Medicaid Reimbursement Rates For Community Care Foster Family Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Other Types Of Home And Community Based Service Care Providers And Services.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services To Study The Feasibility Of Increasing The Medicaid Reimbursement Rates For Community Care Foster Family Homes, Expanded Adult Residential Care Homes, And Other Types Of Home And Community Based Service Care Providers And Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3629) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to HMS. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR4 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
SCR10 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
SCR10 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashimoto, McKelvey, Ward excused (3).
Subjects
Community Care Foster Family Home (CCFFH)
Expanded Adult Residential Care Home (E-ARCH)
Feasibility Study
Home and Community Based Service (HCBS)
Increase
Medicaid Reimbursement
Expanded Adult Residential Care Home (E-ARCH)
Feasibility Study
Home and Community Based Service (HCBS)
Increase
Medicaid Reimbursement