HI SR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating July 20, 2014, As "tranquility Base Day" In Hawaii To Honor The Forty-fifth Anniversary Of The Apollo 11 Lunar Landing At Tranquility Base And Urging The United Nations Educational, Scientific And Cultural Organization To Include Tranquility Base And Associated Artifacts On The World Heritage List.
Title
Apollo 11; Lunar Landing; Forty-Fifth Anniversary; "Tranquility Base Day"; July 20, 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-04-14. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-14. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3148) with recommendation of adoption. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-14 1:35PM in conference room 224. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=39&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/SR39_.HTM |