HI SR38 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Hawaii Public Housing Authority's Application For A Choice Neighborhoods Grant And Urging The United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development To Select The Hawaii Public Housing Authority As A Choice Neighborhoods Grant Recipient.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Choice Neighborhoods Grant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) One Day Notice 04-26-12. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3570) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim, Ryan. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-23-12 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3534), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS will hold a public decision making on 04-16-12 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-28 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-12 10:00AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |