HI SR34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR34
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission And The County Of Hawaii To Collaborate To Identify Sea Level Rise At Kahaluu Bay And Jointly Pursue A Master Plan To Relocate The Pavilion At Kahaluu Bay, Hawaii.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaptation Commission And The County Of Hawaii To Collaborate To Identify Sea Level Rise At Kahaluu Bay And Jointly Pursue A Master Plan To Relocate The Pavilion At Kahaluu Bay, Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-21 1:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR34 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR52 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32
SCR52 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 32