HI SR34 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating The Thirtieth Anniversary Of Hawaii's Sister-state Relationship With The Guangdong Province.
Title
Commemorating the 30th Anniversary of Guangdong Province Sister-State Relationship with Hawaii
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-15. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1167) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Tokuda. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-15 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to TSI. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |