HI SR33 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Volunteer Week In The State Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1754) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to LCA.
2019-03-07SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback