HI SR29 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR29
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And Kauai Department Of Public Works To Conduct A Study To Identify And Recommend Methods To Alleviate Traffic Congestion At Certain Intersections Along The Kaumualii Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3708) with recommendation of adoption. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR29 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to PSM, JDC.