HI SR28 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Acquire By Eminent Domain The Seawall And The Real Property Underneath The Seawall That Is Located On Or Near The Seaward Boundaries Of Property Between 2943 Kalakaua Avenue And 3019 Kalakaua Avenue, Oahu, Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Acquire By Eminent Domain The Seawall And The Real Property Underneath The Seawall That Is Located On Or Near The Seaward Boundaries Of Property Between 2943 Kalakaua Avenue And 3019 Kalakaua Avenue, Oahu, Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateThe committee on WTL deferred the measure.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-05SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback