HI SR27 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR27
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii State Department Of Education School Food Services Branch To Adopt An Addendum To Its Agreements For The aina Pono Hawaii State Farm To School Program Requiring The Procurement Of Goods And/or Services From Food Hubs.
Title
Urging The Hawaii State Department Of Education School Food Services Branch To Adopt An Addendum To Its Agreements For The aina Pono Hawaii State Farm To School Program Requiring The Procurement Of Goods And/or Services From Food Hubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-30-21. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:20PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR27 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR38 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR38 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.