HI SR27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR27
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Food And Drug Administration To Eliminate Its Blood Donor Deferral Policy On The Collection Of Blood And Blood Components From Men Who Have Sex With Men.
Title
Requesting The United States Food And Drug Administration To Eliminate Its Blood Donor Deferral Policy On The Collection Of Blood And Blood Components From Men Who Have Sex With Men.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR27 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Re-Referred to CPH.
HR197 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
HR197 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Blood Donation
Deferral
Eligibility Requirements
Men Who Have Sex With Men
United States Food and Drug Administration
Deferral
Eligibility Requirements
Men Who Have Sex With Men
United States Food and Drug Administration
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=27&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR27_.HTM |