HI SR21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR21
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Conduct A Feasibility Study On The Development Of A Statewide Interagency System For Filing And Maintaining Documents Required Of Individuals And Organizations Accessing Government Services Online.
Title
Requesting The Office Of Enterprise Technology Services To Conduct A Feasibility Study On The Development Of A Statewide Interagency System For Filing And Maintaining Documents Required Of Individuals And Organizations Accessing Government Services Online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-06-22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3707) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to GVO. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR21 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR27 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
SCR27 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.