HI SR21 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR21
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism And Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Cost Analysis Study Of Consolidating West Hawaii State Offices Into A Single Conveniently Located Complex.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism And Department Of Accounting And General Services To Conduct A Cost Analysis Study Of Consolidating West Hawaii State Offices Into A Single Conveniently Located Complex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR21 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR32 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31
SCR32 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 31
Subjects
Consolidation
Cost Analysis Study
Department of Accounting and General Services
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
State Offices
Cost Analysis Study
Department of Accounting and General Services
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
State Offices