HI SR208 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR208
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Various State Government Entities To Take Certain Actions To Effectively Leverage Educational Resources In The State To Ensure Career Readiness Workforce Development.
Title
Requesting Various State Government Entities To Take Certain Actions To Effectively Leverage Educational Resources In The State To Ensure Career Readiness Workforce Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-22. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3646) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Wakai. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR208 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR120 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 27
SCR215 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR120 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to HHH, HET, referral sheet 27
SCR215 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Audit
College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources
Feasibility
Hawaii P-20
Honolulu Community College
Nursing Program
Report
University of Hawaii
College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources
Feasibility
Hawaii P-20
Honolulu Community College
Nursing Program
Report
University of Hawaii