HI SR2 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging This Body To Endorse The Participation Of Taiwan As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Supporting The Further Progress On The United States-taiwan Initiative On 21st-century Trade, A Speedy Conclusion To This Negotiation, And Encouraging The United States Trade Representative To Commence Negotiations To Enter Into A Bilateral Trade Agreement With Taiwan; And Supporting The State Of Hawaii's Thirty-first Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And Commemorating The Forty-fifth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.
Title
Urging This Body To Endorse The Participation Of Taiwan As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Supporting The Further Progress On The United States-taiwan Initiative On 21st-century Trade, A Speedy Conclusion To This Negotiation, And Encouraging The United States Trade Representative To Commence Negotiations To Enter Into A Bilateral Trade Agreement With Taiwan; And Supporting The State Of Hawaii's Thirty-first Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan And Commemorating The Forty-fifth Anniversary Of The Taiwan Relations Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3495) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR2 (Same As) 2024-05-31 - Certified copies of resolution sent, 05-31-24