HI SR2 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR2
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Funds For Native Hawaiian Housing Block Grants Under The Native American Housing Assistance And Self-determination Act And Identify And Secure Other Forms Of Direct Assistance To Address The Affordable Housing Needs Of The Native Hawaiian Population And Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Assist And Train Individual Hawaiian Homesteads On The Technical Aspects And Processes Involved In Expending And Utilizing Native Hawaiian Housing Block Grants.
Title
Strongly Urging The United States Department Of Housing And Urban Development And The United States Congress To Provide Additional Federal Funds For Native Hawaiian Housing Block Grants Under The Native American Housing Assistance And Self-determination Act And Identify And Secure Other Forms Of Direct Assistance To Address The Affordable Housing Needs Of The Native Hawaiian Population And Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Assist And Train Individual Hawaiian Homesteads On The Technical Aspects And Processes Involved In Expending And Utilizing Native Hawaiian Housing Block Grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3712) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, J.Keohokalole. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-20 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HOU. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR2 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Adopted.
HR4 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR4 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39