HI SR195 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR195
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Evaluate Traffic Congestion, Highway Flooding, And Road Safety Issues On Hawaii Island.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Evaluate Traffic Congestion, Highway Flooding, And Road Safety Issues On Hawaii Island.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1429) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred to TRS. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR195 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR235 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR235 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Hawaii Island
Kuakini Highway
Statewide Transportation Improvement Program
Study
Traffic
Hawaii Island
Kuakini Highway
Statewide Transportation Improvement Program
Study
Traffic