HI SR157 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/JDC.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of Information Practices To Clear The Backlog Of Appeals Filed Pursuant To Chapter 92f, Hawaii Revised Statutes, The Uniform Information Practices Act (modified), By January 1, 2023.
Title
Urging The Office Of Information Practices To Clear The Backlog Of Appeals Filed Pursuant To Chapter 92f, Hawaii Revised Statutes, The Uniform Information Practices Act (modified), By January 1, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to GVO/JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR157 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SCR165 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/JDC.
SCR165 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to GVO/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=157&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SR157_.HTM |