HI SR15 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR15
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The Economic Impacts Of Domestic Out-of-state Students.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The Economic Impacts Of Domestic Out-of-state Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-22. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3719) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR15 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
HR76 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR21 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR76 (Same As) 2022-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4).
SCR21 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Domestic Students
Economic Development
Education
Out-of-state Students
Study
Domestic Students
Economic Development
Education
Out-of-state Students
Study