HI SR146 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Counties To Update The Design And Format Of Vehicle Registration Plates In Response To Growing Electric Vehicle And Hybrid Vehicle Sales.
Title
Requesting The Counties To Update The Design And Format Of Vehicle Registration Plates In Response To Growing Electric Vehicle And Hybrid Vehicle Sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-23. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542) with recommendation of adoption. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, McKelvey. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TCA added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-23 3:01PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR150 (Same As) 2023-05-22 - Certified copies of resolutions sent.