HI SR146 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR146
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-18-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-18-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Create A Color-coded Advisory System To Address The Rapidly Changing Threat Of Covid-19.
Title
Urging The Governor To Create A Color-coded Advisory System To Address The Rapidly Changing Threat Of Covid-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 03-18-20. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 4 offered. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR146 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.